EP0992762 - Method and device for transmitting information to a programmable projectile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OERLIKON CONTRAVES AG Birchstrasse 155 8050 Zürich / CH | [2000/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boss, André Allenmoosstrasse 138 8050 Zürich / CH | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Hotz, Klaus c/o OK pat AG, Patente Marken Lizenzen, Chamerstrasse 50 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Hotz, Klaus, Dipl.-El.-Ing./ETH c/o OK pat AG, Patente Marken Lizenzen, Hinterbergstrasse 36, Postfach 5254 6330 Cham / CH | Application number, filing date | 99118445.8 | 17.09.1999 | [2000/15] | Priority number, date | CH19980002033 | 08.10.1998 Original published format: CH 203398 | [2000/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0992762 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0992762 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F42C17/04, F42C11/06, F41G7/00 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
F41G7/306 (EP,US);
F42C11/065 (EP,US);
F42C17/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Übertragung von Informationen auf programmierbare Geschosse | [2000/15] | English: | Method and device for transmitting information to a programmable projectile | [2000/15] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour transmettre des informations à un projectile programmable | [2000/15] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 02.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 06.03.2002 | IE | 06.03.2002 | DK | 06.06.2002 | PT | 06.06.2002 | LU | 17.09.2002 | CY | 30.09.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/10] | FI | 06.03.2002 | |
IE | 06.03.2002 | ||
DK | 06.06.2002 | ||
PT | 06.06.2002 | ||
CY | 30.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 06.03.2002 | |
IE | 06.03.2002 | ||
DK | 06.06.2002 | ||
PT | 06.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | FI | 06.03.2002 | |
IE | 06.03.2002 | ||
PT | 06.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | FI | 06.03.2002 | |
PT | 06.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 06.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2415362 (HENRY MIDGLEY ALBERT, et al) [A] 1,3,7,8 * column 1, line 6 - line 33 *; | [A]GB1581919 (FERRANTI LTD); | [A]EP0082445 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [A] 1,4-6 * abstract * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 3 *; | [Y]US5343795 (ZIEMBA RICHARD T [US], et al) [Y] 1,4-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 20 - column 2, line 34 * * column 3, line 54 - line 63 * * column 5, line 44 - line 55 *; | [YDA]EP0802392 (CONTRAVES AG [CH]) [YD] 1,4-6 * figure 1 * * abstract * * page 2, line 17 - line 20 * * page 3, line 1 - line 25 * [A] 7-13 |