EP0971036 - Sensor and production method of and measurement method using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601 / JP | ||
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU CO., LTD. 57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamamoto, Katsumi Kyoto Daiichi Kagaku Co.,Ltd., 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo, Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Okuda, Hisashi Kyoto Daiichi Kagaku Co.,Ltd., 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo, Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Helbing, Jörg, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 99118452.4 | 06.04.1996 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | JP19950082332 | 07.04.1995 Original published format: JP 8233295 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971036 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0971036 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, G01N27/327 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
C12Q1/002 (EP,US);
C12Q1/005 (EP,US);
Y10S435/817 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/02] | Title | German: | Sensor, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Messverfahren zur Verwendung davon | [2000/02] | English: | Sensor and production method of and measurement method using the same | [2000/02] | French: | Capteur, procédé pour sa production et la mesure l'utilisant | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 04.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96105518.3 / EP0736607 | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2230865 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) [A] 1,5* the whole document *; | [A]EP0502504 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5 * page 3, column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 38; example - *; | [A]EP0537761 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0636879 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document * |