EP1084623 - A process for the preparation of a frozen confection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. P.O.Box 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Groh, Björn F. 1145 Coventry Way, Apt.A Marysville, OH 43040 / US | 02 /
Bisperink, Christiaan Eden-Roc 4 1073 Savigny / CH | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Alain 55, avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | [2001/12] | Application number, filing date | 99118488.8 | 18.09.1999 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1084623 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1084623 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/04, A23G9/08, A23G9/14 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
A23G9/04 (EP,US);
A23G9/08 (EP,US);
A23G9/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Eiskonfekt | [2001/12] | English: | A process for the preparation of a frozen confection | [2001/12] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un article de confiserie glacée | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 31.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.04.2004 | BE | 28.04.2004 | CH | 28.04.2004 | CY | 28.04.2004 | FI | 28.04.2004 | IT | 28.04.2004 | LI | 28.04.2004 | NL | 28.04.2004 | DK | 28.07.2004 | GR | 28.07.2004 | SE | 28.07.2004 | ES | 08.08.2004 | LU | 18.09.2004 | IE | 20.09.2004 | PT | 28.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
CY | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
NL | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
LU | 18.09.2004 | ||
IE | 20.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
NL | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
IE | 20.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
IE | 20.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
LI | 28.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU1374465 ; | [YA]GB1137368 (DCA FOOD IND) [Y] 3,4 * page 2, line 55 - line 61 * * page 2, line 81 - line 104 * * page 3, line 57 - line 85 * * figure 1 * [A] 1; | [A]FR2494962 (KIRK CHEM AS [DK]) [A] 1* example - *; | [A]US4431682 (SMITH GORDON C [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 21 - line 31 * * column 5, line 10 - line 36 *; | [XAY] - ARBUCKLE, Ice Cream, WESTPORT, AVI, (1986), XP002127081 [X] 1,2,7,9 * page 213 - page 215 * * page 222 - page 225 * * page 224, line 27 - line 37 * [A] 5,6,8 [Y] 3,4 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 04, Database accession no. 1990-028589, XP002127082 & SU1374465 A 19890630 (REFRIG IND RES DES TECHN INST) [X] 1 * abstract * |