EP1013814 - Shuttle thread monitoring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAURER STICKSYSTEME AG 9320 Arbon / CH | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deeg, Thomas Reutlingerstrasse 39 8472 Seuzach / CH | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 99118508.3 | 18.09.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | DE19981059158 | 21.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19859158 | [2000/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1013814 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D05C11/14 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
D05C11/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2001/11] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schiffchenfaden-Überwachung | [2000/26] | English: | Shuttle thread monitoring | [2000/26] | French: | Surveillance de fil de navette | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 29.12.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 04.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.02.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE7830446U (PROTECHNA HERBST & CO KG); | [A]DE3432527 (ZSK STICKMASCH GMBH); | [A]US5159890 (ARNOLD KURT ET AL); | [A]US3326153 (HÄUSLE L) |