EP0962230 - Needle device, particularly hypodermic needle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MDC Investment Holdings, Inc. Delaware Trust Building, Suite 200 900 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware / US | [1999/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Botich, Michael J. 336 Highland Drive Oxnard, CA 93035 / US | 02 /
Halseth, Thor R. 367 Buckboard Circle Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | [2000/23] |
Former [1999/49] | 01 /
Botich, Michael J. 336 Highland Drive Oxnard, CA 93035 / US | ||
02 /
Halseth, Thor R. 1223 Village Court Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | Representative(s) | Hanson, William Bennett, et al Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Hanson, William Bennett, et al Bromhead Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | ||
Former [2004/23] | Newby, Martin John Bromhead Johnson Kingsbourne House 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | ||
Former [1999/49] | Newby, Martin John JY & GW Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99118538.0 | 07.11.1990 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0962230 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0962230 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0962230 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32, A61M5/50, A61M5/31 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
A61M5/3129 (EP);
A61M5/3234 (EP);
A61M2005/3231 (EP);
A61M2005/3235 (EP);
A61M2005/3241 (EP);
A61M2205/581 (EP);
A61M2205/583 (EP);
A61M2205/6081 (EP);
A61M5/3202 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1999/49] | A61M5/32, A61M5/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/38] |
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Nadelvorrichtung, insbesondere Subkutannadel | [1999/49] | English: | Needle device, particularly hypodermic needle | [1999/49] | French: | Dispositif d'aiguille, en particulier aiguille hypodermique | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 22.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90917229.8 / EP0568525 | EP96114810.3 / EP0747075 | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.06.2004 | BE | 30.06.2004 | CH | 30.06.2004 | IT | 30.06.2004 | LI | 30.06.2004 | NL | 30.06.2004 | DK | 30.09.2004 | GR | 30.09.2004 | SE | 30.09.2004 | ES | 11.10.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/13] | AT | 30.06.2004 | |
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
NL | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.09.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
ES | 11.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 30.06.2004 | |
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.09.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
ES | 11.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 30.06.2004 | |
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.09.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 30.06.2004 | |
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 30.06.2004 | ||
LI | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 30.06.2004 | |
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 30.06.2004 | |
GR | 30.09.2004 | ||
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | GR | 30.09.2004 | |
SE | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 30.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2197792 (POWER RICHARD KITELEY, et al) [A] 9 * abstract *; | [XA]WO8900435 (GAARDE GERDA INGRID MARIA [DK], et al) [X] 1 * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 30 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 4,15; | [XA]CH669910 (MICHEL ELIE RITZI) [X] 15 * page 3, column L, line 5 - page 3, column R, line 5 * * figures A,F,H * [A] 1; | [XA]EP0347742 (VENTURINI ALDO) [X] 15 * column 16, line 13 - column 17, line 8 * * figures 38,39 * [A] 1; | [XA]WO9007948 (CARALT BATLLE JAIME [ES]) [X] 1 * figure - * [A] 2,15; | [XA]US4955870 (RIDDERHEIM KRISTEN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 2,9A-9E * [A] 2; | [EA]US5049133 (VILLEN PASCUAL JOEE A [ES]) [E] 1-3,15 * abstract *[A] 4 |