EP0989433 - Optical system and optical apparatus having the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sunaga, Toshihiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Akiyama, Takeshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/13] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99118557.0 | 20.09.1999 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | JP19980284802 | 21.09.1998 Original published format: JP 28480298 | JP19990260240 | 14.09.1999 Original published format: JP 26024099 | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0989433 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0989433 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02B17/08, G02B15/14, G02B15/16, G02B13/18 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
G02B17/086 (EP,KR,US);
G02B15/14 (KR);
G02B17/0848 (EP,KR,US);
G02B17/0896 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/13] | G02B15/14, G02B17/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/07] |
Former [2000/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optisches System und dieses aufweisendes optisches Gerät | [2000/13] | English: | Optical system and optical apparatus having the same | [2000/13] | French: | Système optique et appareil optique ayant cet système optique | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 11.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/14] | 07.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/14] | Request for further processing for: | 01.10.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.10.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0802436 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-6,8,9,11; | [A]EP0790513 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,5,9,11; | [A]EP0730180 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-6; | [A]EP0730169 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,4-6,9 |