EP0989355 - Illumination ribbon with side luminiscent fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PD-LAPP SYSTEMS GmbH Am Gewerbepark 7 01723 Wilsdruff / DE | [2002/36] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states PSS Umwelttechnik Apparatebau GmbH Mühlenweg 3 06749 Bitterfeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jährig, Mike Dipl.-Ing. Fabrikstrasse 30 02625 Bautzen / DE | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Kailuweit, Frank, et al Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Postfach 320 139 01013 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | Kailuweit, Frank, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Würzburger Strasse 51 01187 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2000/13] | Kailuweit, Frank, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Würzburger Strasse 51 01187 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 99118585.1 | 21.09.1999 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | DE1998216869U | 21.09.1998 Original published format: DE 29816869 U | [2000/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0989355 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F21V8/00 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
F21K2/00 (EP);
G02B6/0008 (EP);
G02B6/001 (EP);
G09F13/18 (EP);
G09F13/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/13] | Title | German: | Leuchtband aus seitlich lumineszenten Fasern | [2000/13] | English: | Illumination ribbon with side luminiscent fibers | [2000/13] | French: | Ruban pour illumination à fibres latéralement luminescentes | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 06.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4234907 (DANIEL MAURICE) [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * column A; figures 1-14; claims 1-35 *; | [X]EP0392022 (AROMAC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * column A; figures 1-.6; claim 1 *; | [X]US4885663 (PARKER JEFFREY R [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,10 * column 4 - column 5; figures 10,11 *; | [X]WO8700012 (ZAPPE PETERS ULLA BRITTA [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4202754 | DE19615516 | DE29619113U | DE19504600 | DE19981016666 |