EP0989687 - Automatic frequency control in a Rake receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kandala, Srinivas 8701 NE 54th Street, C-1 Vancouver, WA 98662 / US | 02 /
Somayazulu, V. Srinivasa 12910 SW Winterlake Drive Tigard, OR 97233 / US | 03 /
Kowalski, John M. 501 SE 12rd Avenue, y-177 Vancouver, WA 98683 / US | 04 /
Yamamoto, Hirohiko 801 kamatori central mansion, 803-16 Ariyshi-cho Midori-ku, chiba-shi CHIBA / JP | [2000/16] |
Former [2000/15] | 01 /
Kandala, Srinivas 8701 NE 54th Street, C-1 Vancouver, WA 98662 / US | ||
02 /
Somayazulu, V. Srinivasa 12910 SW Winterlake Drive Tigard, OR 97233 / US | |||
03 /
Kowalski, John M. 501 SE 12rd Avenue, y-177 Vancouver, WA 98683 / US | |||
04 /
Ymamoto, Hiroshi 801 kamatori central mansion, 803-16 Ariyshi-cho Midori-ku, chiba-sh CHIBA / JP | |||
Former [2000/13] | 01 /
Kandala, Srinivas 8701 NE 54th Street, C-1 Vancouver, WA 98662 / US | ||
02 /
Somayazulu, V. Srinivasa 12910 SW Winterlake Drive Tigard, OR 97233 / US | |||
03 /
Kowalski, John M. 501 SE 12rd Avenue, y-177 Vancouver, WA 98683 / US | |||
04 /
Yamamoto, Hirohiko 803-16 Ariyoshi-cho, Midori-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99118633.9 | 21.09.1999 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | US19980160551 | 24.09.1998 Original published format: US 160551 | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0989687 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0989687 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707, H03J7/06 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
H04B1/7115 (EP,US);
H04B1/7117 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2001/30] |
Former [2000/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Automatische Frequenzregelung in einem Rake-Empfänger | [2000/13] | English: | Automatic frequency control in a Rake receiver | [2000/13] | French: | Contrôle automatique de fréquence dans un récepteur de type RAKE | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/13] | 09.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.07.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.07.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.07.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5361276 (SUBRAMANIAN RAVI [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 1, line 60 - line 63 * * column 4, line 25 - line 36 * * column 4, line 55 - line 68 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 23 * * column 7, line 4 - line 20 * * column 9, line 37 - line 63 *; | [X] - GONG K S ET AL, "A FREQUENCY TRACKING RAKE DEMODULATOR FOR MULTIPATH CHANNELS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. (MILCOM),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19900930), vol. -, pages 1020 - 1024, XP000221670 [X] 1,10 * abstract * * page 1020, column R - column L * |