EP0989606 - Power module substrate, method of producing the same, and semiconductor device including the substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 1-5-1, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 1-5-1, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagase, Toshiyuki, c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corp. Central Research Institute, 1-297 Kitabukuro-Cho Omiya-Shi, Saitama 330-8508 / JP | 02 /
Nagatomo, Yoshiyuki, c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corp Central Research Institute, 1-297 Kitabukuro-Cho Omiya-Shi, Saitama 330-8508 / JP | 03 /
Kubo, Kazuaki, c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corp. Central Research Institute, 1-297 Kitabukuro-Cho Omiya-Shi, Saitama 330-8508 / JP | 04 /
Shimamura, Shoichi, c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corp. Central Research Institute, 1-297 Kitabukuro-Cho Omiya-Shi, Saitama 330-8508 / JP | 05 /
Goshi, Koichi, c/o Mitsubishi Materials Corp. Central Research Institute, 1-297 Kitabukuro-Cho Omiya-Shi, Saitama 330-8508 / JP | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | Türk - Gille - Hrabal - Struck Patentanwälte - European Patent Attorneys, Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99118655.2 | 22.09.1999 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | JP19980267712 | 22.09.1998 Original published format: JP 26771298 | JP19980267713 | 22.09.1998 Original published format: JP 26771398 | JP19980352797 | 11.12.1998 Original published format: JP 35279798 | JP19990029551 | 08.02.1999 Original published format: JP 2955199 | JP19990138662 | 19.05.1999 Original published format: JP 13866299 | JP19990235059 | 23.08.1999 Original published format: JP 23505999 | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0989606 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0989606 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0989606 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/40, H01L23/473 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
H01L23/4006 (EP,US);
H01L23/24 (EP,US);
H01L23/473 (EP,US);
H01L2023/4056 (EP,US);
H01L2023/4087 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2001/12] |
Former [2000/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSMODULSUBSTRAT SOWIE SEIN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, UND HALBLEITERVORRICHTUNG MIT DEM SUBSTRAT | [2000/13] | English: | Power module substrate, method of producing the same, and semiconductor device including the substrate | [2000/13] | French: | Substrat pour un module de puissance et procédé pour sa fabrication, et dispositif sémiconducteur comprenant le substrat | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 11.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5172755 (SAMAROV VICTOR M [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 40 - column 7, line 10; figure 4 * [A] 2-29; | [XA]US5155661 (NAGESH VODDARAHALLI K [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 44; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-29; | [XA]JPH0778936 ; | [A]US5666269 (ROMERO GUILLERMO L [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 18; figure 1 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 1995, no. 06, & JP07078936 A 19950320 (SONY CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-29 |