EP0992485 - Chiral compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farrand, Louis, Dr. 73, Woodhouse Road Davyhulme, Manchester M41 7NT / GB | [2000/15] | Application number, filing date | 99118675.0 | 22.09.1999 | [2000/15] | Priority number, date | EP19980118646 | 02.10.1998 Original published format: EP 98118646 | [2000/26] |
Former [2000/15] | DE1981918646 | 02.10.1998 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0992485 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0992485 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/734, C09K19/58, C07D317/32, // C07M7:00 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
C09K19/588 (EP);
C07C69/734 (EP);
C07D317/32 (EP);
C09K19/586 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/52] |
Former [2000/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Chirale Verbindungen | [2000/15] | English: | Chiral compounds | [2000/15] | French: | Composés chiraux | [2000/15] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 13.10.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH | 20.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.11.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 31.10.2003 | [2004/31] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0351746 (HOECHST AG) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0441213 (F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document * | [Y] - DUBAL H R ET AL, "THREE CLASSES OF NEW CHIRAL DOPANTS: SYNTHESIS AND PHYSICAL QUALIFICATION AS DOPANTS FOR PRACTICAL FLC-MIXTURES", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS,JP,PUBLICATION OFFICE JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. TOKYO, vol. 27, no. 12, PART 02, ISSN 0021-4922, page L2241-2244, XP000080785 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.27.L2241 |