EP0993006 - Material and its manufacturing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eltex-Elektrostatik Gesellschaft mbH Blauenstrasse 67 D-79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [2000/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knopf, Franz Kantstrasse 2 77815 Bühl / DE | 02 /
Prasse, Torsten c/o TU Hamburg/Harburg, Martin-Leuschel-Ring 16 21071 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
FLANDIN, Lionel Le villaret T9 73210 Peisey-Nancroix / FR | [2000/31] |
Former [2000/15] | 01 /
Knopf, Franz Kantstrasse 2 77815 Bühl / DE | ||
02 /
Prasse, Torsten c/o TU Hamburg/Harburg, Martin-Leuschel-Ring 16 21071 Hamburg / DE | Representative(s) | Säger, Manfred Säger & Hofmann Patent AG Feldgüetliweg 130 8706 Meilen (ZH) / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Säger, Manfred Säger & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei (GbR) Römersteig 2 Postfach 5 7304 Maienfeld / CH | ||
Former [2000/15] | Säger, Manfred Postfach 41 7014 Trin / CH | Application number, filing date | 99118734.5 | 22.09.1999 | [2000/15] | Priority number, date | DE1998145411 | 03.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19845411 | [2000/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0993006 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0993006 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01C13/00, H01C7/02, H01C17/26 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
H01C7/005 (EP);
H01T19/04 (EP);
H01T23/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/15] | H01C13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2002/43] |
Former [2000/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Werkstoff und Verfahren zum Herstellen desselben | [2000/15] | English: | Material and its manufacturing process | [2000/15] | French: | Matériau et procédé pour sa fabrication | [2000/15] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 17.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5084211 (KAWAGUCHI TOSHIYUKI ET AL) [X] 1,11-24,26-30,35,36 * the whole document *; | [A]US5521383 (FURUKAWA KAZUHIKO ET AL) [A] 1-36 * column 7, line 59 - column 8, line 21; figures 14-16 *; | [DA]EP0208169 (ELTEX ELEKTROSTATIK GMBH) [DA] 1,11-24,26-30,35,36 * the whole document *; | [A]US4774492 (SHIER JOHN S) [A] 1,6,7,29,32 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]US3676633 (MINO ALFONSO DI) [A] 1,6,7,29,32 * column 2, line 13 - line 66 * | [X] - PRASSE T ET AL, "IN SITU OBSERVATION OF ELECTRIC FIELD INDUCED AGGLOMERATION OF CARBON BLACK IN EPOXY RESIN", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19980601), vol. 72, no. 22, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 2903 - 2905, XP000765034 [X] 1-36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.121454 |