EP0963102 - System and method for facsimile data transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 6455 Lusk Boulevard San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Propach, David S. 4041 Florida Street San Diego, California 92117 / US | 02 /
Grob, Matthew S. 10606 Aderman Atp. 4 San Diego, California 92126 / US | 03 /
Jacobs, Paul E. 9075 La Jolla Shores Lane La Jolla, California 92037 / US | 04 /
Karmi, Gadi 1220 Cave Street Apt. 3 La Jolla, California 92037 / US | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al Tomkins & Co. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 99118769.1 | 15.11.1994 | [1999/49] | Priority number, date | US19930152157 | 15.11.1993 Original published format: US 152157 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0963102 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0963102 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0963102 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/333, H04N1/411, H04N1/00 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
H04N1/32641 (EP,US);
H04N1/32 (KR);
H04N1/32619 (EP,US);
H04N1/32683 (EP,US);
H04N1/327 (EP,US);
H04N1/32795 (EP,US);
H04N1/33323 (EP,US);
H04N1/33376 (EP,US);
H04N1/411 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/49] | H04N1/333 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/49] | Extension states | LT | 23.09.1999 | SI | 23.09.1999 | Title | German: | Faksimiledatenübertragungssystem und -Verfahren | [1999/49] | English: | System and method for facsimile data transmission | [1999/49] | French: | Système et procédé de transmission de données de facsimile | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 13.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95902565.1 / EP0729685 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 20.12.1999 | 06   M01   Fee paid on   20.12.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2006 | BE | 04.01.2006 | CH | 04.01.2006 | LI | 04.01.2006 | NL | 04.01.2006 | DK | 04.04.2006 | GR | 05.04.2006 | ES | 15.04.2006 | PT | 05.06.2006 | [2008/21] |
Former [2008/17] | AT | 04.01.2006 | |
BE | 04.01.2006 | ||
CH | 04.01.2006 | ||
LI | 04.01.2006 | ||
NL | 04.01.2006 | ||
DK | 04.04.2006 | ||
ES | 15.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | AT | 04.01.2006 | |
BE | 04.01.2006 | ||
CH | 04.01.2006 | ||
LI | 04.01.2006 | ||
NL | 04.01.2006 | ||
DK | 04.04.2006 | ||
ES | 15.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 04.01.2006 | |
CH | 04.01.2006 | ||
LI | 04.01.2006 | ||
NL | 04.01.2006 | ||
DK | 04.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 04.01.2006 | |
CH | 04.01.2006 | ||
LI | 04.01.2006 | ||
NL | 04.01.2006 | ||
PT | 05.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 04.01.2006 | |
CH | 04.01.2006 | ||
LI | 04.01.2006 | ||
NL | 04.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 04.01.2006 | |
CH | 04.01.2006 | ||
LI | 04.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 04.01.2006 | |
LI | 04.01.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5466016 ; | [A]JPS5880966 ; | [A]US3670099 (OLIVER DONALD S); | [XA]EP0057826 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]) [X] 4 * abstract * [A] 1,5; | [XA]US4571632 (SCHAPHORST RICHARD A [US], et al) [X] 4 * the whole document * [A] 1,5; | [A]WO9202100 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9312608 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19790724), vol. 003, no. 086, Database accession no. (E - 125), & JP54066016 A 19790528 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 7,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830802), vol. 007, no. 174, Database accession no. (E - 190), & JP58080966 A 19830516 (SANYO DENKI KK) [A] * abstract * |