EP0969683 - Method of providing service and data rate negotiation in a mobile communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 6455 Lusk Boulevard San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blakeney, Robert D. II P.O. Box 776370 Steamboat Springs, CO 80477 / US | 02 /
Tiedemann, Edward G. Jr. 4350 Bromfield Avenue San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al Tomkins & Co. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 99118771.7 | 14.06.1995 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | US19940260192 | 15.06.1994 Original published format: US 260192 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0969683 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0969683 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04L29/06, H04L12/56 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
H04W28/18 (EP,US);
H04W72/04 (FI);
H04B7/264 (EP,US);
H04L25/20 (EP,US);
H04W28/16 (EP,US);
H04W28/24 (EP,US);
H04W28/06 (EP,US);
H04W28/22 (EP,US);
H04W4/00 (EP,US);
H04W72/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Extension states | LT | 23.09.1999 | LV | 23.09.1999 | SI | 23.09.1999 | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Bereitstellen von Diensten und Verhandlung von Datenraten in einem mobilen Kommunikationssystem | [2000/01] | English: | Method of providing service and data rate negotiation in a mobile communication system | [2000/01] | French: | Procédé de fourniture de service et négociation du débit dans un système de communication mobile | [2000/01] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 11.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.07.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95923933.6 / EP0719491 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.03.2005 | BE | 16.03.2005 | CH | 16.03.2005 | LI | 16.03.2005 | NL | 16.03.2005 | IE | 14.06.2005 | LU | 14.06.2005 | DK | 16.06.2005 | GR | 16.06.2005 | SE | 16.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 14.06.2005 | ||
LU | 14.06.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/18] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 14.06.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 14.06.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 14.06.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0210698 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al); | [A]WO9314588 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | Examination | US4953210 |