EP0967533 - Image-forming machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOCERA MITA CORPORATION 2-28, Tamatsukuri 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 540 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states KYOCERA MITA CORPORATION 2-28, Tamatsukuri 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka 540 / JP | ||
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states MITA INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri Higashi-ku Osaka 540 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Endoh, Hirohisa, c/o Kyocera Mita corp., Ltd. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku Osaka 540 / JP | 02 /
Shin, Kohji, c/o Kyocera Mita Corp., Ltd. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku Osaka 540 / JP | 03 /
Kawashima, Tetsuro, c/o Kyocera Mita Corp., Ltd. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku Osaka 540 / JP | [2004/22] |
Former [1999/52] | 01 /
Endoh, Hirohisa, c/o Mita Industrial Co., Ltd. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku Osaka 540 / JP | ||
02 /
Shin, Kohji, c/o Mita Industrial Co., Ltd. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku Osaka 540 / JP | |||
03 /
Kawashima, Tetsuro, c/o Mita Industrial Co., Ltd. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku Osaka 540 / JP | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99118789.9 | 13.01.1995 | [1999/52] | Priority number, date | JP19940002496 | 14.01.1994 Original published format: JP 249694 | JP19940002497 | 14.01.1994 Original published format: JP 249794 | JP19940003126 | 17.01.1994 Original published format: JP 312694 | JP19940003127 | 17.01.1994 Original published format: JP 312794 | JP19940003128 | 17.01.1994 Original published format: JP 312894 | JP19940003129 | 17.01.1994 Original published format: JP 312994 | JP19940003130 | 17.01.1994 Original published format: JP 313094 | JP19940003131 | 17.01.1994 Original published format: JP 313194 | JP19940042382 | 14.03.1994 Original published format: JP 4238294 | [1999/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0967533 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0967533 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0967533 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/10, G03G15/08 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
G03G15/09 (EP,US);
G03G15/0817 (EP,US);
G03G15/0822 (EP,US);
G03G15/0849 (EP,US);
G03G15/0853 (EP,US);
G03G15/0893 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/52] | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsgerät | [1999/52] | English: | Image-forming machine | [1999/52] | French: | Appareil de formation d'image | [1999/52] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 17.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95100440.7 / EP0663629 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.05.2004 | IT | 26.05.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 26.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH04107585 ; | [YP]US5307128 (MURASAKI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [YP] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPS6041079 ; | [A]JPH05249828 ; | [A]JPS57151985 ; | [A]JPS58220157 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920730), vol. 016, no. 355, Database accession no. (P - 1394), & JP04107585 A 19920409 (MINOLTA CAMERA CO LTD) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850709), vol. 009, no. 163, Database accession no. (P - 371), & JP60041079 A 19850304 (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940107), vol. 018, no. 007, Database accession no. (P - 1670), & JP05249828 A 19930928 (KONICA CORP) [A] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821214), vol. 006, no. 255, Database accession no. (P - 162), & JP57151985 A 19820920 (FUJI XEROX KK) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840407), vol. 008, no. 075, Database accession no. (P - 266), & JP58220157 A 19831221 (FUJI XEROX KK) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |