EP0989325 - Belt for continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Hideaki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Shimada, Takamichi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Akagi, Hirofumi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/13] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99118803.8 | 23.09.1999 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | JP19980271596 | 25.09.1998 Original published format: JP 27159698 | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0989325 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0989325 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0989325 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16G5/16 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
F16G5/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/14] |
Former [2000/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Riemen für stufenloses Getriebe | [2000/13] | English: | Belt for continuously variable transmission | [2000/13] | French: | Courroie pour transmission à variation continue | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 11.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPS6228548 ; | [D]JPS5757938 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]GB2087032 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 1,3 * page 1, line 127 - page 2, line 3; figure 6 *; | [A]EP0828096 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [D]JPH1089429 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870710), vol. 011, no. 213, Database accession no. (M - 605), & JP62028548 A 19870206 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [Y] 1,3 * abstract * [A] 4 | by applicant | JPS5757938 |