blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0994124

EP0994124 - Process for preparing microencapsulated spherical polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.01.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 06.09.2006  [2006/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer Chemicals AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[2004/02]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Halle, Olaf, Dr.
Wolfskaul 4
51061 Köln / DE
02 / Strüver, Werner, Dr.
Hans-Sachs-Strasse 4
51375 Leverkusen / DE
[2000/16]
Application number, filing date99119064.630.09.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDE199814705013.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19847050
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994124
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994124
Date:14.06.2000
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994124
Date:23.03.2005
Language:DE
[2005/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2000
ClassificationIPC:C08F2/18
[2000/16]
CPC:
C08F2/18 (EP); C08F220/06 (EP); C08F220/44 (EP);
C08F220/56 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/09]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung mikroverkapselter kugelförmiger Polymerisate[2000/16]
English:Process for preparing microencapsulated spherical polymers[2000/16]
French:Procédé de préparation de polymères sphériques microencapsulés[2000/16]
Examination procedure14.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
14.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.01.2005Fee for grant paid
24.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE30.09.2005
[2006/36]
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0046535  (BAYER AG [DE]);
 [DA]EP0051210  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]);
 [A]EP0842951  (BAYER AG [DE]);
 [A]US4259465  (BARABAS EUGENE S)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.