Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] |
22.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
02.01.2001 | Change - extension states | |
17.11.2000 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
17.11.2000 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
11.11.2000 | Definitive list of designations | published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
25.02.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] |