EP0992329 - Method to produce enlarged or reduced copies of three dimensional structures, and copies made by this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brouwers, Michel (El-Zahra) c/o Bettina Dummer, Seestrasse 123a 86938 Schondorf/Ammersee / DE | [2000/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/15] | Application number, filing date | 99119191.7 | 07.10.1999 | [2000/15] | Priority number, date | DE1998146129 | 08.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19846129 | [2000/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0992329 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/38, B44B1/04, B29C61/00, B44C5/00 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
B22C7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/52] |
Former [2000/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Vergrösserungen und/oder Verkleinerungen von räumlichen Strukturen sowie nach diesem Verfahren hergestellte Körper | [2000/15] | English: | Method to produce enlarged or reduced copies of three dimensional structures, and copies made by this method | [2000/15] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de copies à une échelle plus grande ou plus petite d'objets tridimensionnels, et copies obtenues par ce procédé | [2000/15] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/36] | 28.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.11.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.11.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB735918 (RELIABLE TOY COMPANY LTD) [Y] 1,2,6 * page 1, line 44 - line 62; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]EP0082894 (POPULATION COUNCIL INC) [Y] 1,2,6 * page 12, line 11 - line 35; claims 3,4,14 *; | [A]DE2414928 (AGFA GEVAERT AG) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2092073 (SANDHILL BULLION LTD) [A] 6 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS606244 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850525), vol. 009, no. 121, Database accession no. (M - 382), & JP60006244 A 19850112 (JIYANOME SEWING MACHINE KOGYO KK) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |