Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH088604B | Global Dossier | 29.01.1996 | B2 | JPH06164563 | 10.06.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25456992 | 24.09.1992 | JP14904192 | 09.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2967648B | Global Dossier | 25.10.1999 | B2 | JPH05336089 | 17.12.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP14121492 | 02.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2897482B | Global Dossier | 31.05.1999 | B2 | JPH0564274 | 12.03.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP24655791 | 02.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2871296B | Global Dossier | 17.03.1999 | B2 | JPH05336582 | 17.12.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP14122392 | 02.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0977392 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP14121492 | 02.06.1992 | EP92311783 | 24.12.1992 | JP14904192 | 09.06.1992 | JP14122392 | 02.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0971499 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP14121492 | 02.06.1992 | EP92311783 | 24.12.1992 | JP14904192 | 09.06.1992 | JP14122392 | 02.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0971498 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP14121492 | 02.06.1992 | EP92311783 | 24.12.1992 | JP14904192 | 09.06.1992 | JP14122392 | 02.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0967751 | Global Dossier | 29.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP14121492 | 02.06.1992 | EP92311783 | 24.12.1992 | JP14904192 | 09.06.1992 | JP14122392 | 02.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0971556 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP14121492 | 02.06.1992 | EP92311783 | 24.12.1992 | JP14904192 | 09.06.1992 | JP14122392 | 02.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5592474 | 07.01.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US99572192 | 23.12.1992 | JP14121492 | 02.06.1992 | JP24655791 | 02.09.1991 | JP14904192 | 09.06.1992 | JP14122392 | 02.06.1992 | US44500295 | 19.05.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5627832 | 06.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US99572192 | 23.12.1992 | JP14121492 | 02.06.1992 | JP14904192 | 09.06.1992 | JP14122392 | 02.06.1992 | US44500295 | 19.05.1995 | US59891996 | 09.02.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5636219 | 03.06.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US99572192 | 23.12.1992 | JP14121492 | 02.06.1992 | JP14904192 | 09.06.1992 | JP14122392 | 02.06.1992 | US44500295 | 19.05.1995 | US59935896 | 09.02.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5671214 | 23.09.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US99572192 | 23.12.1992 | JP14121492 | 02.06.1992 | JP14904192 | 09.06.1992 | JP14122392 | 02.06.1992 | US44500295 | 19.05.1995 | US59897396 | 09.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0572739 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2000 | B1 | EP0572739 | 12.10.1994 | A3 | EP0572739 | 08.12.1993 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP14121492 | 02.06.1992 | JP14904192 | 09.06.1992 | JP14122392 | 02.06.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69230910T | 07.12.2000 | T2 | DE69230910D1 | 18.05.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP14121492 | 02.06.1992 | JP14904192 | 09.06.1992 | JP14122392 | 02.06.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5426633 | 20.06.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | JP14121492 | 02.06.1992 | JP14904192 | 09.06.1992 | JP14122392 | 02.06.1992 | Type | Earlier application | EP0572739 |