EP0971556 - System for processing synchronization signals with phase synchronization in a mobile communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Hironao NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tsuji, Toshiya NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [2000/02] | Orchard, Oliver John JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99119221.2 | 24.12.1992 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | JP19920141214 | 02.06.1992 Original published format: JP 14121492 | JP19920141223 | 02.06.1992 Original published format: JP 14122392 | JP19920149041 | 09.06.1992 Original published format: JP 14904192 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971556 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04J3/06 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
H04J3/0641 (EP,US);
H04J3/0626 (EP,US);
H04J3/0688 (EP,US);
H04J3/14 (EP,US);
H04Q11/04 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0407 (EP,US);
H04Q3/545 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1302 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1304 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1308 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13097 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13098 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13103 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13106 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1316 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13166 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13213 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13217 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1325 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13292 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13305 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1332 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13322 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13349 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1336 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13377 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1338 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13405 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/02] | Title | German: | Verarbeitungssystem für Synchronisationssignale mit Phasensynchronisation in einem Mobilkommunikationsnetzwerk | [2000/02] | English: | System for processing synchronization signals with phase synchronization in a mobile communication network | [2000/02] | French: | Système de traitement de signaux de synchronisation avec une synchronisation de phase dans un réseau de communication mobile | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 13.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/46] | 27.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92311783.2 / EP0572739 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6123433 ; | [A]US4301534 (GENTER ROLAND E) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 14 * * column 3, line 3 - line 32 * * column 7, line 54 - column 8, line 8 * * column 10, line 9 - line 29; figure 2 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860617), vol. 10, no. 170, Database accession no. (E - 412), & JP61023433 A 00000000 (CANON) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - N. MEHRAVARI ET AL., "Frame Synchronization in a Photonic Network of Time Multiplexed Space Switches Via a Feedback Scheme", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK US, (199006), vol. 38, no. 6, pages 830 - 837, XP000148231 [A] 1-3 * page 832, column L, line 40 - column R, line 19; figure 7 * * page 835, column R, line 6 - line 36; figure 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.57475 |