blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971449

EP0971449 - Electric connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.07.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 25.07.2007  [2007/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FCI
145/147 Rue Yves Le Coz
78000 Versailles / FR
[N/P]
Former [2005/33]For all designated states
FCI
145-147 rue Yves Le Coz
78000 Versailles / FR
Former [2003/22]For all designated states
FCI
53, rue de Châteaudun
75009 Paris / FR
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL S.A.
Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Genta, Alessandro
Via Pietro Cossa, 280/20
10151 Torino / IT
02 / Bortoloni, Roberto
Via Ariosto, 50/D
10036 Settimo Torinese / IT
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Franzolin, Luigi, et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Franzolin, Luigi, et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date99119379.824.04.1996
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateIT1995TO0032426.04.1995         Original published format: IT TO950324
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971449
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971449
Date:07.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:H01R13/436
[2000/02]
CPC:
H01R13/4362 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Verbinder[2000/02]
English:Electric connector[2000/02]
French:Connecteur électrique[2000/02]
Examination procedure23.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
15.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2005Fee for grant paid
10.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96912035.1  / EP0823137
Opposition(s)08.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
11.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
18.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
18.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
19.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
22.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.09.2005
BE07.09.2005
NL07.09.2005
SE07.12.2005
GB24.04.2006
[2007/30]
Former [2006/34]AT07.09.2005
BE07.09.2005
NL07.09.2005
SE07.12.2005
Former [2006/25]BE07.09.2005
NL07.09.2005
SE07.12.2005
Former [2006/22]NL07.09.2005
SE07.12.2005
Former [2006/13]SE07.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]US4705337  (MAEDA AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4767361  (HOSHINO TERUAKI [JP], et al)[A] 1;
 [A]US5316504  (JINNO KEISHI [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0606903  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1,2,6 * column 3, line 7 - column 7, line 33; figures 1,3-6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.