EP0991298 - Method for localization of an acoustic image out of man's head via a headphone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARNIS SOUND TECHNOLOGIES, Co., Ltd. 2-7-9 Kitasenzoku Ota-Ku Tokyo 145-0062 / JP | [2011/29] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states ARNIS SOUND TECHNOLOGIES, Co., Ltd. 463-1, Shimogawaramachi Yasakatoriimaesagaru Shimogawaradouri, Higashiyama-ku Kyoto / JP | ||
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states OpenHeart Ltd. 7-4, Ohtsuka 4-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states A Limited Responsibility Company Research Network 463, Shimogawaramachi, Yasakatoriisagaru, Shimogawaradouri Higashiyama-ku, Kyoto / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Wataru, c/o OpenHeart Ltd. 7-4, Ohtsuka 4-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99119387.1 | 29.09.1999 | [2000/14] | Priority number, date | JP19980291348 | 30.09.1998 Original published format: JP 29134898 | [2000/22] |
Former [2000/14] | JP19980291248 | 30.09.1998 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0991298 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0991298 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | [2006/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991298 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04S1/00 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
H04S1/005 (EP,US);
H04S2420/01 (EP,US);
H04S2420/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Lokalisierung eines Schallbildes mit einem Kopfhörer ausserhalb des Zuhörerkopfes. | [2011/06] | English: | Method for localization of an acoustic image out of man's head via a headphone | [2000/14] | French: | Procédé de localisation d'image acoustique hors tête de l'auditeur par l'intermediaire d'un casque d'écoute | [2000/14] |
Former [2000/14] | Verfahren zur Lokalisierung von Schallbild aus von Zuhörerkopf mit einem Kopfhörer | Examination procedure | 07.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.07.2011 | CY | 27.07.2011 | FI | 27.07.2011 | IE | 29.09.2011 | LU | 29.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | GR | 28.10.2011 | PT | 28.11.2011 | [2015/33] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 29.09.2011 | ||
LU | 29.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 29.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 29.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 27.07.2011 | |
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 27.07.2011 | |
PT | 28.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4087631 (YAMADA AKITOSHI, et al) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 10 - column 5, line 27; figures 2-11; claims 1-5 * [A] 2; | [XA]WO9704620 (YUGENGAISHA I TO DENKITEKKOUSY [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * [A] 2; | US6178247 [ ] (OGITA KAZUAKI [JP]) [ ] * column 3, line 34 - column 6, line 31; figure 1 * |