EP0979661 - Inhalation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratoire Glaxosmithkline S.A.S. 100, route de Versailles 78163 Marly-le-Roi Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Laboratoire GlaxoSmithKline S.A.S. 100, route de Versailles 78163 Marly-le-Roi Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states LABORATOIRE GLAXO WELLCOME 43 rue Vineuse 75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaeffer, Alain Emile Edouard, Laboratories Glaxo 23 rue Lavoisier 27025 Evreux / FR | 02 /
Seguelas, Etienne, APE Medical Z.I. Route de Souppes, Boite postale 13 77570 Chateau-Landon / FR | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Pike, Christopher Gerard Pike & Co. Hayes Loft 68A Hayes Place Marlow, Bucks. SL7 2BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | Pike, Christopher Gerard Pike & Co. Hayes Loft 68A Hayes Place Marlow, Bucks. SL7 2BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99119531.4 | 13.09.1995 | [2000/07] | Priority number, date | GB19940018702 | 16.09.1994 Original published format: GB 9418702 | GB19950007713 | 13.04.1995 Original published format: GB 9507713 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979661 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979661 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
A61M15/0065 (EP,US);
A61M15/00 (KR);
A61M15/0068 (EP,US);
A61M2202/064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/07] | Extension states | LT | 01.10.1999 | LV | 01.10.1999 | SI | 01.10.1999 | Title | German: | Inhalator | [2000/07] | English: | Inhalation device | [2000/07] | French: | Dispositif d'inhalation | [2000/07] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 20.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 09.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95932737.0 / EP0835146 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.12.2002 | BE | 04.12.2002 | CH | 04.12.2002 | GR | 04.12.2002 | IT | 04.12.2002 | LI | 04.12.2002 | NL | 04.12.2002 | DK | 04.03.2003 | SE | 04.03.2003 | PT | 05.03.2003 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2004/05] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
BE | 04.12.2002 | ||
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
BE | 04.12.2002 | ||
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
BE | 04.12.2002 | ||
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 04.12.2002 | |
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 04.12.2002 | |
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | SE | 04.03.2003 | |
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 04.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4274403 (STRUVE ROGER L); | [XD]WO9200771 (INNOVATA BIOMED LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0520440 (SCHERING CORP [US]); | [XY]WO9414492 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) |