EP1074304 - Document shredder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHLEICHER & Co. INTERNATIONAL AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Bergheimer Strasse 6-12 D-88677 Markdorf/Bodensee / DE | [2001/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gninka, Martina Hutbühlstrasse 20 a 88266 Überlingen / DE | 02 /
Dieck, Leopold E., Dr. Marktstrasse 40 88212 Ravensburg / DE | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier und Partner Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99119730.2 | 05.10.1999 | [2001/06] | Priority number, date | DE1999134818 | 24.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19934818 | [2001/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1074304 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1074304 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B02C18/00 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
B02C18/0007 (EP);
A47L5/38 (EP);
B08B15/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/06] | Title | German: | Dokumentenvernichter | [2001/06] | English: | Document shredder | [2001/06] | French: | Destructeur de documents | [2001/06] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 25.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.06.2004 | FI | 16.06.2004 | IT | 16.06.2004 | NL | 16.06.2004 | DK | 16.09.2004 | GR | 16.09.2004 | SE | 16.09.2004 | ES | 27.09.2004 | AT | 05.10.2004 | LU | 05.10.2004 | BE | 31.10.2004 | CH | 31.10.2004 | LI | 31.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | PT | 16.11.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/18] | CY | 16.06.2004 | |
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
NL | 16.06.2004 | ||
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
AT | 05.10.2004 | ||
LU | 05.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
CH | 31.10.2004 | ||
LI | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/47] | FI | 16.06.2004 | |
NL | 16.06.2004 | ||
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
AT | 05.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
CH | 31.10.2004 | ||
LI | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 16.06.2004 | |
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
AT | 05.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
CH | 31.10.2004 | ||
LI | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 16.06.2004 | |
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
CH | 31.10.2004 | ||
LI | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 16.06.2004 | |
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 16.06.2004 | |
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 16.06.2004 | |
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 16.06.2004 | |
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 16.06.2004 | |
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 16.06.2004 | |
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 16.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH07252790 ; | [A]JPH0724348 ; | [Y]US3620461 (PELLESCHI JOE, et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 2, line 41 - line 57; figures 2,5 *; | [XAY]DE3303408 (BERGER ZOLTAN) [X] 1,2,15,17,19 * page 9, line 27 - page 10, line 24; figures 1,2; claims 1,15 * [A] 8,9,13,14,16,18 [Y] 3-7,10-12; | [Y]US4558827 (BERGER ZOLTAN [DE]) [Y] 10-12 * column 3, line 43 - line 68; figure 3 *; | [Y]US4754933 (LEUTHOLD KARL [DE], et al) [Y] 5,6,10-12 * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 49; figure 2 *; | [A]US5035366 (HASHIMOTO MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 16* column 1, line 15 - line 19 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07252790 A 19951003 (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 7 * abstract * [A] 8,9 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 1995, no. 04, & JP07024348 A 19950127 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 13 * abstract * |