EP0969467 - Disk cartridge and tray for loading the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Yuji 46-1-205, Yamadaikehigashi-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-01 / JP | 02 /
Kawamura, Ichiro 2-13-20, Yamasaka, Higashisumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 546 / JP | 03 /
Kashihara, Toshiaki 1-31-8, Higashinakaburi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | 04 /
Hata, Yoshio 5-41-10, Kozu Katano-shi, Osaka 576 / JP | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99119771.6 | 14.09.1995 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | JP19940224369 | 20.09.1994 Original published format: JP 22436994 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0969467 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0969467 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/03, G11B17/04 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
G11B17/047 (EP,US);
G11B17/056 (EP,US);
G11B17/057 (EP,US);
G11B23/0307 (EP,US);
G11B23/0308 (EP,US);
G11B23/0311 (EP,US);
G11B23/0316 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/37] |
Former [2000/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Plattenkassette und Tablett zum Laden derselben | [2000/01] | English: | Disk cartridge and tray for loading the same | [2000/01] | French: | Cassette à disque et plateau de chargement de cette cassette à disque | [2000/01] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 18.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/33] | 05.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/33] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95114486.4 / EP0703582 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0368416 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * column 14, line 24 - column 17, line 3; figure - *; | [A]EP0076064 (DYSAN CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 35; figures 1-2D *; | [A]EP0576253 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 10, line 38 - line 56; figure - * * column 12, line 21 - column 14, line 7 *; | [A]US5216558 (GRIFFITH DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 5 - line 35; figure - *; | [A]US3529301 (HIRUTA KATSUYA) [A] 1 * column 5, line 4 - line 39; figure - *; | [A]EP0375988 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [PA]EP0645768 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1 * column A; figure - * |