EP1091174 - Method for characteristics adjustment of burners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Building Technologies AG Gubelstrasse 22 6300 Zug / CH | [2001/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Link, Hans Vormbergerstrasse 27 76547 Sinzheim / DE | 02 /
Hauter, Harald Am Kehler Tor 16 76437 Rastatt / DE | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/41] | Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf., et al Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99119859.9 | 06.10.1999 | [2001/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1091174 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F23N1/02, F23N5/00 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
F23N1/022 (EP);
F23N5/003 (EP);
F23N2227/20 (EP);
F23N2233/06 (EP);
F23N2235/06 (EP);
F23N2235/16 (EP);
F23N5/006 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Einstellung von Kennlinien von Brennern | [2001/15] | English: | Method for characteristics adjustment of burners | [2001/15] | French: | Méthode de réglage des caractéristiques de brûleurs | [2001/15] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/10] | 28.09.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0614051 (LANDIS & GYR BUSINESS SUPPORT [CH]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 14 - column 9, line 41; figure - *; | [A]DE3010147 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 12, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [A]EP0195866 (AUTOFLAME ENG LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * page 15, paragraph 2 - page 20, paragraph 3; figure - *; | [A]EP0428373 (CONTROL TECHTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 11, line 56 - column 12, line 43; figure - *; | [A]US5190454 (MURRAY STUART W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 9; figure - *; | [A]EP0339135 (LANDIS & GYR AG [CH]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 8 - column 7, line 36; figure - * |