EP1026337 - Roofing and method for manfacturing a single ply roof covering, in particular for flat roofs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roland-Werke Dachbaustoffe und Bauchemie GmbH & Co. KG Zeppelinstrasse 1 28832 Achim / DE | [2000/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taieb, Marzouki Ahornring 25 27321 Thedinghausen / DE | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Möller, Friedrich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Möller, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99119881.3 | 07.10.1999 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | DE1998148414 | 21.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19848414 | DE1998151372 | 07.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19851372 | DE1999109483 | 04.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19909483 | [2000/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1026337 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04D5/12 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
E04D5/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2001/17] |
Former [2000/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Abdichtbahn und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer einlagigen Abdichtung von Dächern, insbesondere Flachdächern | [2000/32] | English: | Roofing and method for manfacturing a single ply roof covering, in particular for flat roofs | [2000/32] | French: | Membrane d'étanchéité et procédé pour la réalisation d'un recouvrement monocouche, en particulier de toits plats | [2000/32] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Drawings | 14.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Drawings {1} | 12.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/49] | 28.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.03.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.03.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]BE1005075 (DERBIT BELGIUM) [X] 1-4,10-16 * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 30 * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 17 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 5-9; | [Y]US3121649 (OLIVER) [Y] 5 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 20 * * column 3, line 40 - column 3, line 51 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 41 * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP0522546 (NAUE FASERTECHNIK) [Y] 6-9 * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 14 * * figures 2,3,5 *; | [A]FR1511612 (PREISLER) [A] 6 * page 1, column 1, paragraph 5 * * page 1, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 1, column 2, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE3316301 (METZELER KAUTSCHUK) [A] 7-9 * page 5, line 27 - page 5, line 35 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 9 * * figures 2,3 * |