EP0971357 - A software carrier with a pluarlity of synchronized audio tracks and a data stream derived therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/02] | An audio and video disc reproducing apparatus | ||
[2001/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TIME WARNER ENTERTAINMENT CO., L.P. 4000 Warner Boulevard Burbank, CA 91522 / US | [2000/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cookson, Christopher J. 7825 Torreyson Drive Los Angeles, CA 90046 / US | 02 /
Ostrover, Lewis S. 4021 Cumberland Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90027 / US | 03 /
Lieberfarb, Warren N. 684 MacCulloch Drive Los Angeles, CA 90049 / US | [2000/16] |
Former [2000/02] | 01 /
Cookson, Christopher J. 7825 Torreyson Drive Los Angeles, CA 90046 / US | ||
02 /
Ostrover, Lewis S. 4021 Cumberland Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90027 / US | |||
03 /
Lieberfarb, Warren N. 15147 Mulholland Drive Los Angeles, CA 90077 / US | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2000/02] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk, Patent Attorneys, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99120118.7 | 13.10.1994 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | US19930144791 | 29.10.1993 Original published format: US 144791 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0971357 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0971357 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0971357 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/10, G11B19/02, G11B20/10, G11B20/12, H04N5/926, G11B27/32, G11B19/12, G11B7/00 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
H04N9/8244 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (KR);
G09B5/04 (EP,US);
G10H1/0041 (EP,US);
G10H1/363 (EP,US);
G11B19/02 (EP,US);
G11B19/12 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00094 (EP,US);
G11B20/00115 (EP,US);
G11B20/00123 (EP,US);
G11B20/00137 (EP,US);
G11B20/00144 (EP,US);
G11B20/00159 (EP,US);
G11B20/0021 (EP,US);
G11B20/00557 (EP,US);
G11B20/0071 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B20/12 (EP,US);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B20/1254 (EP,US);
G11B27/10 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N9/8063 (EP,US);
H04N9/8216 (EP,US);
H04N9/8238 (EP,US);
G10H2210/056 (EP,US);
G10H2240/036 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2583 (EP,US);
G11B7/0037 (EP);
G11B7/013 (EP);
H04N5/775 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N5/913 (EP,US);
H04N7/0122 (EP,US);
H04N9/7925 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/02] | G11B27/10, G11B19/02, G11B19/12, G11B20/12, G11B20/10, H04N5/92, H04N5/926, G11B27/34, // G11B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/02] | Title | German: | Ein Datenträger mit einer Mehrzahl von synchronisierten Audiospuren und einem davon abgeleiteten Datenstrom | [2001/12] | English: | A software carrier with a pluarlity of synchronized audio tracks and a data stream derived therefrom | [2001/11] | French: | Support de données avec une pluralité des pistes audio synchronisées et un flux de données derivé | [2001/11] |
Former [2000/02] | Audio- und Videoplattenwiedergabegerät | ||
Former [2000/02] | An audio and video disc reproducing apparatus | ||
Former [2000/02] | Appareil servant à reproduire un disque audio et vidéo | Examination procedure | 25.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 14.03.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 06.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94930814.2 / EP0726012 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 19.12.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4794465 (VAN LUYT BALTHASAR A G [NL], et al) [A] 1-17 * column W *; | [A]EP0325325 (PHILIPS & DU PONT OPTICAL [NL], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0459157 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 9-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US5130815 (SILVERMAN MURRAY B [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5,7,9,11,13,15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0521487 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0543667 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [E]EP0644692 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [E] 1-17 * column 5, line 34 - column 10, line 12 * * column 17, line 19 - column 18, line 46 * * column 19, line 14 - line 33 * * column 20, line 41 - column 22, line 39 *; | [E]WO9512276 (TIME WARNER ENTERTAINM CO LP [US]) [E] 1-17 * the whole document * * L: applicant *; | [E]WO9512180 (TIME WARNER ENTERTAINM CO LP [US]) [E] 1-6 * the whole document ** L: applicant *; | [E]EP0677843 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [E] 1-17 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 44 * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 48 * * column 10, line 10 - column 13, line 43; claims 11-14,19,25-27 * |