EP1018292 - Tractor hitch lower link lifting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GKN Walterscheid GmbH Hauptstrasse 150 53797 Lohmar / DE | [2000/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coenen, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Vinxeler Strasse 74 53639 Königswinter / DE | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Harwardt, Günther, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Harwardt, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Harwardt Neumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Brandstrasse 10 53721 Siegburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99120135.1 | 08.10.1999 | [2000/28] | Priority number, date | DE1999100570 | 09.01.1999 Original published format: DE 19900570 | DE1999139967 | 23.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19939967 | [2000/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1018292 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1018292 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1018292 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/19] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1018292 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01B63/10 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
A01B63/1006 (EP,US);
A01B63/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/22] |
Former [2000/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hubwerk für die Unterlenker einer Anbauvorrichtung eines Traktors | [2000/28] | English: | Tractor hitch lower link lifting device | [2000/28] | French: | Dispositif de levage pour bras inférieurs d'accouplement de tracteur | [2000/28] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2233174 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [X]DE2329761 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]DE3815409 (STEYR DAIMLER PUCH AG [AT]) [X] 1-11 * column 4, line 7 - line 30; figure - *; | [A]US4825956 (KANATO YUJI [JP], et al) [A] 7* figure - * | by applicant | WO9603024 |