EP1070859 - Fastening device with at least two profiled bars with grooves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/04] | Device for fastening grooved profiled bars with grooves | ||
[2004/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMS Förder- und Montage-Systeme Schmalzhofer GmbH Werkstrasse 6-8 75031 Eppingen-Mühlbach / DE | [2001/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmalzhofer, Rainer Starenweg 2 75031 Eppingen / DE | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Clemens, Gerhard, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Müller, Clemens & Hach Lerchenstrasse 56 74074 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Clemens, Gerhard, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei, Müller, Clemens & Hach, Lerchenstrasse 56 74074 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 99120226.8 | 09.10.1999 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | DE1999212756U | 21.07.1999 Original published format: DE 29912756 U | DE1999216259U | 17.09.1999 Original published format: DE 29916259 U | [2001/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1070859 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1070859 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1070859 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/18 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
F16B7/187 (EP);
E04B2/766 (EP);
E04B1/5831 (EP);
E04B2001/5881 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] | Title | German: | Verbindungseinrichtung mit zumindest zwei Profilstäben mit Nuten | [2004/16] | English: | Fastening device with at least two profiled bars with grooves | [2004/16] | French: | Dispositif de fixation avec au moins deux barres profilées rainurées | [2004/16] |
Former [2001/04] | Verbindungseinrichtung für Profilstäbe mit Nuten | ||
Former [2001/04] | Device for fastening grooved profiled bars with grooves | ||
Former [2001/04] | Dispositif de fixation de barres profilées rainurées | Examination procedure | 02.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 31.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.09.2004 | FI | 15.09.2004 | GB | 15.09.2004 | IE | 15.09.2004 | IT | 15.09.2004 | NL | 15.09.2004 | LU | 09.10.2004 | BE | 31.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | SE | 15.12.2004 | ES | 26.12.2004 | PT | 15.02.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/18] | CY | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
LU | 09.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 15.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4244396 (HERON SONDERMASCHINEN UND STEU [AT]) [A] 1,3,4,7 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 16 ** column 6, line 14 - line 29; figures 1,3 *; | [AD]DE19520892 (HERON SONDERMASCHINEN UND STEU [AT]) [AD] 1,3,4,7 * figures 1,2,12; claims 1,2 * | by applicant | DE19520892 |