EP0995874 - Method for lowering an externally powered window pane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Stgt. Zuffenhausen, Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Stgt. Zuffenhausen, Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klösters, Elmar Eichenstrasse 21 71287 Weissach / DE | [2000/17] | Application number, filing date | 99120303.5 | 12.10.1999 | [2000/17] | Priority number, date | DE1998148652 | 22.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19848652 | [2000/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0995874 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/17] | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/16, B60J1/17 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
E05F15/70 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/604 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/32 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/356 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/358 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/51 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/00 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/12 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum absenken einer fremdkraftbetätigten Scheibe | [2000/17] | English: | Method for lowering an externally powered window pane | [2000/17] | French: | Procédé d'abaissement d'une vitre actionnée par une force exterieure | [2000/17] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/49] | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | DE19632910 |