blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0997681

EP0997681 - Storage vessel for liquified gases [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2009
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.03.2009  [2009/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Linde AG
Leopoldstrasse 252
80807 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/48]For all designated states
Linde Aktiengesellschaft
Leopoldstrasse 252
80807 München / DE
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
Linde Aktiengesellschaft
Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Rüdiger, Horst, Dipl.-Ing.
Fachanter Weg 8
86163 Augsburg / DE
02 / Reese, Wilfried-Henning, Dipl.-Ing.
Käthe-Kollwitz-Strasse 24
85716 Unterschleissheim / DE
03 / Sillat, Diethard, Dipl.-Ing.
Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 38
82152 Planegg / DE
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Kasseckert, Rainer
Linde Aktiengesellschaft
Patent und Marken
Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Kasseckert, Rainer
Linde Aktiengesellschaft, Zentrale Patentabteilung
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Application number, filing date99120476.914.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateDE199814976728.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19849767
[2000/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0997681
Date:03.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0997681
Date:19.03.2008
[2008/12]
Former [2008/11]Type: A3 Search report
No.:EP0997681
Date:
Status:(deleted)
[2008/11]
[2008/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.2008
ClassificationIPC:F17C9/02, F17C13/00
[2008/06]
CPC:
F17C1/00 (EP,US); F17C1/16 (EP,US); F17C2201/0147 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0157 (EP,US); F17C2201/0161 (EP,US); F17C2201/0171 (EP,US);
F17C2201/056 (EP,US); F17C2203/03 (EP,US); F17C2203/0658 (EP,US);
F17C2209/227 (EP,US); F17C2221/012 (EP,US); F17C2223/0161 (EP,US);
F17C2223/033 (EP,US); F17C2223/041 (EP,US); F17C2223/043 (EP,US);
F17C2225/0153 (EP,US); F17C2225/043 (EP,US); F17C2227/0304 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0374 (EP,US); F17C2227/046 (EP,US); F17C2250/0417 (EP,US);
F17C2265/03 (EP,US); F17C2265/034 (EP,US); F17C2265/035 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0105 (EP,US); F17C2270/0168 (EP,US); F17C2270/0184 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0189 (EP,US); Y02E60/32 (EP,US); Y10S220/901 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2000/18]F17C1/00, F17C13/00
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2008/48]
Former [2000/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Speicherbehälter für verflüssigte Gase[2000/18]
English:Storage vessel for liquified gases[2000/18]
French:Réservoir pour le stockage de gaz liquéfiés[2000/18]
Examination procedure07.08.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/13]
30.10.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2009/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200810   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE4320556  (LINDE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 7; figure 3 *;
 [Y]DE19524681  (LINDE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * column 3, lines 26-41 *;
 [A]DE4326138  (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, lines 31-65 *;
 [A]DE4212626  (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 7, lines 9-48; figure 2 *;
 [X]US3338238  (WARNCKE ERNST A) [X] 1-8 * column 1, lines 24,30,69 * * column 2, lines 32,38 *;
 [A]DE19524680  (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, lines 57-66 * * column 2, lines 20-24 *;
 [X]FR2739912  (SARDOU MAX [FR]) [X] 1-8 * page 1, line 42 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.