EP1032159 - Method for information encryption and transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson, R. Brent 111 West 5th Street Suite 300 Tulsa Oklahoma 74103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states Johnson, R. Brent 111 West 5th Street, Suite 300 Tulsa, Oklahoma 74103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99120498.3 | 15.10.1999 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | US19990255837 | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 255837 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1032159 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1032159 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, H04L9/00 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
H04L9/0891 (EP);
H04L2209/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/35] | H04L9/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Datenverschlüsselung und -Übertragung | [2000/35] | English: | Method for information encryption and transfer | [2000/35] | French: | Procédé de chiffrage et de transfert d'information | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/48] | 04.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.02.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0843439 (DESKTOP GUARDIAN LIMITED) [X] 1-24 * abstract * * column 1, line 32 - column 2, line 25 *; | [X] - GIDDY J P ET AL, "AUTOMATED CRYPTANALYSIS OF TRANSPOSITION CIPHERS", COMPUTER JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1994), vol. 37, no. 5, ISSN 0010-4620, pages 429 - 436, XP000485457 [X] 1-24 * page 429, column L * * page 430, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/comjnl/37.5.429 |