blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1001219

EP1001219 - Gas cock with thermocouple safety valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.01.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.03.2003  [2003/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ISPHORDING Germany GmbH
Askay 10
57439 Attendorn / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/39]For all designated states
ISPHORDING Germany GmbH
Finnentroper Strasse 16
57439 Attendorn / DE
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
AGT Gas Technology GmbH
Finnentroper Strasse 16
57439 Attendorn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Koch, Jürgen
Wiesenstrasse 8
57439 Attendorn / DE
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]COHAUSZ HANNIG DAWIDOWICZ & PARTNER
Patentanwälte Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date99120516.215.10.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateDE199815212812.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19852128
[2000/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1001219
Date:17.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2000
ClassificationIPC:F23N5/10, F23K5/00, F23Q9/14
[2000/20]
CPC:
F23K5/007 (EP,US); F23N5/107 (EP,US); F23Q9/14 (EP,US);
F23N2241/08 (EP,US); Y10T137/1516 (EP,US); Y10T137/87981 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   IT [2001/05]
Former [2000/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gashahn mit thermoelektrischem Sicherheitsventil[2000/20]
English:Gas cock with thermocouple safety valve[2000/20]
French:Robinet à gaz avec une soupape de sécurité à thermocouple[2000/20]
Examination procedure13.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
16.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/10]
30.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2189578  (RINNAI KK) [X] 1,4-10,12,13 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0725250  (MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI SPA [IT]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE9210319U  (ELOKTRO- UND GAS-ARMATUREN) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDE2943996
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.