EP1094200 - Gas turbine cooled moving blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomita, Yasuoki, Takasago Machinery, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Suenaga, Kiyoshi, Takasago Machinery, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Masada, Junichiro, Takasago Machinery, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Hashimoto, Yukihiro, Takasago Machinery, Mitsubish Heavy Ind., 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99120722.6 | 19.10.1999 | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1094200 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18, F01D11/00 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
F01D11/001 (EP);
F01D5/187 (EP);
F05D2240/81 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2002/03] |
Former [2001/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gekühlte Gasturbinenrotorschaufel | [2001/17] | English: | Gas turbine cooled moving blade | [2001/17] | French: | Aube rotorique refroidie de turbine à gaz | [2001/17] | Examination procedure | 16.11.1999 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 23.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/33] | 10.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0864728 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * * column 9, line 36 - line 41; figure 1 *; | [XY]EP0924383 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019]; figure 1 * * claim 1 * [Y] 1,2; | [Y]DE19811294 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 62; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]GB2250548 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1 * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph 2; figure 2 * [Y] 1,2; | [Y]WO9950534 (PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA [CA]) [Y] 1,2 * page 14, line 11 - page 16, line 22; figure 5 *; | [XY]US5738489 (LEE CHING-PANG [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4; figure 2 * [Y] 1,2; | [Y]US3609057 (RADTKE LELAND J) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, line 50 - line 65 * * column 3, line 52 - line 56; figure . * |