blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0995498

EP0995498 - Pump dispenser and method of making it [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC.
One Seagate Toledo
Ohio 43666 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC.
One Seagate
Toledo Ohio 43666 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Keung, Wing-Kwong
29249 Bates Road
Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Casalonga, Axel, et al
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Casalonga, Axel, et al
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date99120809.121.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateUS1998017675222.10.1998         Original published format: US 176752
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995498
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995498
Date:09.10.2002
[2002/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995498
Date:14.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2002
ClassificationIPC:B05B11/00
[2000/17]
CPC:
B29C45/26 (EP,US); B05B11/1011 (EP,US); B05B11/1095 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/27]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Pumpspender und Herstellungsmethode[2000/17]
English:Pump dispenser and method of making it[2000/17]
French:Distributeur à pompe et méthode de fabrication[2000/17]
Examination procedure21.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/13]
10.04.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
30.10.2003Fee for grant paid
30.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.05.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH08252511  ;
 [A]EP0032542  (KLAGER KARLHEINZ) [A] 1,8* page 5, line 30 - page 8, line 2; figure - *;
 [A]US4606480  (RODRIGUEZ GAZULLA FRANCISCO [ES]) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 66; figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08252511 A 19961001 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD) [A] 1,8 * abstract *
by applicantUS4161288
 US5590834
 US5656227
 US5687877
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.