EP1095973 - Rubber compound for gas valves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL B.V. Laarderhoogtweg 18-20 1101 EA Amsterdam Z.O. / NL | [2001/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feitsma, Jan Louw Van Echtenskanaal NZ 31 7891 TL Klazienaveen / NL | 02 /
Eggink, Roelof Geert Opgang 5 7681 CN Vroomshoop / NL | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph, et al Honeywell Holding AG IP Europe - Law Department Kaiserleistrasse 39 63067 Offenbach am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Sturm, Christoph, et al Honeywell Holding AG, IP Europe Law Dept., Kaiserleistrasse 39 63067 Offenbach am Main / DE | ||
Former [2001/18] | Herzbach, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Honeywell Holding AG, Patent- und Lizenzabteilung, Kaiserleistrasse 39 63067 Offenbach am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 99121244.0 | 25.10.1999 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1095973 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/20, F16K1/30 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
F16K1/30 (EP);
C08K5/20 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/20, C08L21/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gummimischung für Gasventile | [2001/18] | English: | Rubber compound for gas valves | [2001/18] | French: | Composition de gomme pour soupapes de gaz | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01190447 ; | [X]US5118740 (WIDEMAN LAWSON G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7 * abstract *; | [X]EP0586115 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * example - *; | [X] - MUMBAI - INDIA, FINE ORGANICS, (1998), XP002133866 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 36, Database accession no. 1989-260847, XP002133867 & JPH01190447 A 19890731 (FUJIKURA RUBBER WORKS LTD) [X] 1,8,9 * abstract * |