EP1004240 - Device for recognizing plants and/or forms applied to agriculture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dzinaj, Timur, Dipl.-Ing. Thuillestrasse 4 81247 München / DE | 02 /
Hörstkamp, Stephan Kleine, Dipl.-Ing. Riesenbecker Postweg 17a 49477 Ibbenbüren / DE | 03 /
Linz, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing. Lieneschweg 25 49076 Osnabrück / DE | 04 /
Klamt, Steffen, Dipl.-Ing. Lumumbastrasse 24 39126 Magdeburg / DE | 05 /
Gelze, Frank, Dipl.-Ing. Langner Strasse 8 49844 Bawinkel / DE | 06 /
Ruckelshausen, Arno, Prof.Dr. Schelverstrasse 27 49080 Osnabrück / DE | [2000/22] | Application number, filing date | 99121316.6 | 26.10.1999 | [2000/22] | Priority number, date | DE1998154694 | 27.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19854694 | DE1998158552 | 18.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19858552 | [2000/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1004240 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1004240 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A01M7/00, A01B79/00 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
A01B79/005 (EP);
A01M7/0089 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, NL [2001/07] |
Former [2000/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erkennung von Pflanzen und/oder Mustern in landwirtschaftlichen Anwendung | [2000/22] | English: | Device for recognizing plants and/or forms applied to agriculture | [2000/22] | French: | Dispositif de reconnaissance de plantes et/ou de formes apliquées en agriculture | [2000/22] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 08.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.10.2003 | [2005/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [E]US5992758 (MACK ALEXANDER R [CA]) [E] 1,4,5 * column 3, lines 1-21 * * column 3, line 41 - column 452 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5621460 (HATLESTAD JOHN D [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * column 1, line 13 - line 18 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 24 * * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 11 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0576121 (CHEM EQUIPMENT CO LTD AG [US]) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 41 - line 49 * * column 12, line 10 - line 32 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE19530356 (HILKER ANDREAS [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5555464 (HATLESTAD JOHN D [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]DE19642439 (GANZELMEIER HEINZ DR ING [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | DE19642439 |