EP1011131 - Methods for enhancing the metal removal rate during the chemical-mechanical polishing process of a semiconductor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2007/30] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schutz, Ronald Joseph Box 208 RR 1 Millbrook, NY 12545 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2000/42] | 01 /
Schutz, Ronald Joseph Box 208 RR#1 Millbrook, NY 12545 / US | ||
Former [2000/30] | 01 /
Schutz, Ronald Joseph Box 208 RR#1 Milbrook, NY 12545 / US | ||
Former [2000/25] | 01 /
Schutz, Ronald Joseph Box 208 PR 1 Milbrook, NY 12545 / US | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99121400.8 | 27.10.1999 | [2000/25] | Priority number, date | US19980213469 | 17.12.1998 Original published format: US 213469 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1011131 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1011131 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/321 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
C09K3/1463 (EP,US);
H01L21/302 (KR);
H01L21/3212 (EP,US);
H01L21/7684 (EP,US);
H01L21/28568 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2001/10] |
Former [2000/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbesserung der Metallentfernung bei einem chemisch-mechanischen Polierprozess eines Halbleiters | [2000/25] | English: | Methods for enhancing the metal removal rate during the chemical-mechanical polishing process of a semiconductor | [2000/25] | French: | Procédé pour améliorer l'élimination d'un métal lors d'une étape de polissage méchano-chimique d'un semiconducteur | [2000/25] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 22.12.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 12.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 08.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.02.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 25.07.2007 | GB | 27.10.2007 | IE | 30.10.2007 | IT | 31.10.2007 | FR | 21.03.2008 | [2011/27] |
Former [2009/03] | NL | 25.07.2007 | |
GB | 27.10.2007 | ||
IE | 30.10.2007 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 25.07.2007 | |
IE | 30.10.2007 | ||
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | NL | 25.07.2007 | |
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/17] | NL | 25.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9743087 (CABOT CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7 * page 8 - page 10; claims 27,30 * [A] 5,6,8; | [X]US5700383 (FELLER A DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,13,14,16,20 * column 3 * * column 5, line 18 - line 24 * * column 6 - column 7 *; | [XA]US5735963 (OBENG YAW SAMUEL [US]) [X] 20-22 * the whole document * [A] 5-8,11,12,17-19; | [X]US5770095 (SASAKI YASUTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,20 * column 6, line 13 - line 48 * * column 8, line 20 - line 31 *; | [A]US5836806 (CADIEN KENNETH C [US], et al); | [X]WO9853488 (RODEL INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,13-16,19,20 * page 6, line 7 - line 27 * * claims 2,6 * |