EP1001377 - Two-level mini-block storage system for volume data sets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TeraRecon, Inc., A Delaware Corporation 2955 Campus Drive, Suite 325 San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | [2001/31] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peet, William 6 Meridien Way Billerica, Massachusetts 01821 / US | 02 /
Correll, Kenneth 2193 Lunenberg Road Lancaster, Massachusetts 01523 / US | 03 /
Knittel, James 241 Hill Road Groton, Massachusetts 01450 / US | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/20] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99121423.0 | 27.10.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | US19980191865 | 12.11.1998 Original published format: US 191865 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1001377 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1001377 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/00 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
G06T1/60 (EP,US);
G06T15/005 (EP,US);
G06T15/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zweistufiges Miniblock-Speichersystem für Volumendatensätze | [2000/20] | English: | Two-level mini-block storage system for volume data sets | [2000/20] | French: | Système de mémoire minibloc à deux niveaux pour ensembles de données de volume | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/12] | 21.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.10.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - BOER DE M ET AL, "LATENCY- AND HAZARD-FREE VOLUME MEMORY ARCHITECTURE FOR DIRECT VOLUME RENDERING", COMPUTERS AND GRAPHICS, PERGAMON PRESS LTD. OXFORD, GB, (199701), vol. 21, no. 1, ISSN 0097-8493, pages 179 - 187, XP000928975 [Y] 1-7 * page 182, column L, line 7 - line 21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0097-8493(96)00081-7 | [Y] - COHEN-OR D ET AL, "A 3D SKEWING AND DE-SKEWING SCHEME FOR CONFLICT-FREE ACCESS TO RAYSIN VOLUME RENDERING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19950501), vol. 44, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9340, pages 707 - 710, XP000525562 [Y] 1-7 * page 707, column R, line 46 - page 408, column R, line 20 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/12.381958 |