EP1002761 - Modular dispensing tower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lancer Corporation 235 West Turbo Street San Antonio, TX 78216 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states LANCER CORPORATION 235 West Turbo Street San Antonio, TX 78216 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deering, Robert S. 11716 Warfield San Antonio, TX 78216 / US | 02 /
Durham, Samuel 9842 Huntress San Antonio, TX 78255 / US | 03 /
Schroeder, Alfred A. 2811 Whisper Fawn San Antonio, TX 78230 / US | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Moreland, David, Dr., et al Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 99121490.9 | 06.01.1995 | [2000/21] | Priority number, date | US19940178070 | 06.01.1994 Original published format: US 178070 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1002761 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1002761 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/06, B67D1/08 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
B67D1/0864 (EP,US);
B67D1/06 (EP,US);
B67D1/0829 (EP,US);
B67D1/0867 (EP,US);
B67D2210/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/21] | Title | German: | Modularer Getränkespender | [2000/21] | English: | Modular dispensing tower | [2000/21] | French: | Distributeur de boissons modulaire | [2000/21] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 09.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95908437.7 / EP0738234 | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] | Request for further processing for: | 18.01.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.2000 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.08.2004 | IT | 04.08.2004 | DE | 05.11.2004 | ES | 15.11.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/32] | FR | 04.08.2004 | |
DE | 05.11.2004 | ||
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/03] | DE | 05.11.2004 | |
ES | 15.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | ES | 15.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5228312 (WILLIAMS WARREN L [US]) [X] 1-4,6-13,15 * column 2, line 20 - line 68; figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO9000517 (VALPAR IND LTD [GB]); | [A]US4615466 (CREDLE JR WILLIAM S [US]) |