Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] |
03.09.2002 | Change - extension states | |
06.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
10.05.2002 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
10.05.2002 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
09.05.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
30.11.2001 | Change - representative | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] |
08.11.2001 | Renewal fee | |
17.08.2001 | Publication of search report | published on 04.10.2001 [2001/40] |
12.01.2001 | Change - representative | published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] |
17.03.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] |