EP0997165 - Blocking device for ventilation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meltem Lüftungsgeräte GmbH & Co. KG Pfarrgasse 1 82239 Alling / DE | [2000/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reynartz, Armin Abt.Führer-Strasse 35 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Schweiger, Martin Patentanwalt Martin Schweiger Erhardtstraße 12 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | Schweiger, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Leopoldstrasse 77 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/09] | Hanke, Hilmar Patentanwalt Hanke, Hilmar, Dipl.-Ing. Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing., Leopoldstrasse 77 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/18] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99121508.8 | 28.10.1999 | [2000/18] | Priority number, date | DE19981050113 | 30.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19850113 | [2000/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0997165 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0997165 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A62C2/14, A62C2/24 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
F24F13/1486 (EP);
A62C2/14 (EP);
A62C2/242 (EP);
F24F11/35 (EP);
F24F2013/146 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2002/26] |
Former [2000/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Absperrvorrichtung für eine Belüftungseinrichtung | [2000/18] | English: | Blocking device for ventilation device | [2000/18] | French: | Dispositif de blocage pour dispositif de ventilation | [2000/18] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/03] | 13.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.05.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.05.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2230951 (NAILOR HART IND INC [CA]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4146048 (MCCABE FRANCIS J) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19634305 |