EP0999162 - Fuser module for xerographic machine, with integral sheet decurler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pawlik, Robert S. 360 Pineville Lane Webster, NY 14580 / US | 02 /
Piccirilli, Michael E. 110 Hampton Way Penfield, NY 14526 / US | 03 /
Pirwitz, Robert G. 36 Hunters Pointe Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 04 /
Muck, Dennis N. 50 Hilltop Drive Penfield, NY 14526 / US | 05 /
Salotto, Daniel P. 202, Summit Hill Drive Rochester, NY 14612 / US | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99121677.1 | 02.11.1999 | [2000/19] | Priority number, date | US19980186296 | 05.11.1998 Original published format: US 186296 | [2000/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0999162 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0999162 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65H29/00, B65H29/12, B65H23/34, G03G15/00, B65H29/70 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
G03G15/6576 (EP,US);
B65H29/70 (EP,US);
G03G15/2035 (EP,US);
B65H2301/51256 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00544 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00662 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/19] | B65H29/00, B65H29/12, B65H23/34, G03G15/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/40] |
Former [2000/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fixiermodul für xerographisches Gerät, mit integrierter Einrichtung zum Geraderichten von Bögen | [2000/19] | English: | Fuser module for xerographic machine, with integral sheet decurler | [2000/19] | French: | Module de fusion pour appareil xerographique, avec dispositif intégré de redressage de feuilles | [2000/19] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 03.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/09] | 17.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4627718 (WYER ANDREW F [GB]) [A] 1,2,6 * column 20, line 23 - line 28 * * column 20, line 67 - column 21, line 4 * * figures 33,34 *; | [A]US5787331 (OHKUMA KEIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 36 - line 46 * * figures 4-6 *; | [A]JPH09156815 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09156815 A 19970617 (SUZUKA FUJI XEROX KK) [A] 1,4 * abstract * |