Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000143067 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US18629698 | 05.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0999162 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2001 | A3 | EP0999162 | 10.05.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US18629698 | 05.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6002913 | 14.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US18629698 | 05.11.1998 |