Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0998846 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2004 | B1 | EP0998846 | 18.04.2001 | A3 | EP0998846 | 10.05.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19850813 | 04.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE279096T | 15.10.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE19850813 | 04.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19850813 | 31.08.2000 | C2 | DE19850813 | 18.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19850813 | 04.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59910821D1 | 18.11.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19850813 | 04.11.1998 |