EP0998846 - Cutting device for trimming cut flowers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hermanns, Udo Kleinkölnstrasse 3 52062 Aachen / DE | [2000/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/08] | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [2000/19] | Thul, Hermann European Patent Attorney, Patentanwälte Jostarndt & Thul, Eupener Strasse 266 52070 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99121784.5 | 03.11.1999 | [2000/19] | Priority number, date | DE1998150813 | 04.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19850813 | [2000/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0998846 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0998846 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | [2001/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0998846 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01G5/00, A01G3/08, A01G3/00 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
A01G3/00 (EP);
A01G5/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/19] | A01G3/00, A01G5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/19] | Title | German: | Schneidvorrichtung zum Schneiden von Schnittblumen | [2000/19] | English: | Cutting device for trimming cut flowers | [2000/19] | French: | Dispositif de coupe pour raccourcir des fleurs coupées | [2000/19] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.10.2004 | FI | 13.10.2004 | FR | 13.10.2004 | GB | 13.10.2004 | IE | 13.10.2004 | IT | 13.10.2004 | NL | 13.10.2004 | SE | 13.10.2004 | AT | 03.11.2004 | LU | 03.11.2004 | BE | 30.11.2004 | CH | 30.11.2004 | LI | 30.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | DK | 13.01.2005 | GR | 13.01.2005 | ES | 24.01.2005 | PT | 13.03.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/18] | CY | 13.10.2004 | |
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
SE | 13.10.2004 | ||
AT | 03.11.2004 | ||
LU | 03.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
AT | 03.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
AT | 03.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
AT | 03.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GB | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
IE | 13.10.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 13.10.2004 | |
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 13.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0021493 (DOST FRANZ BORGIAS) [Y] 2 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 11 * [A] 1; | [A]US4348832 (HAUSER ALLAN H) [A] 1,2,7,9 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 5; figure - *; | [A]EP0331225 (STENGELBENGEL BV [NL]) [A] 2* column 2, line 2 - line 9 *; | [XAY]GB2305881 (LYNE WILLIAM GEORGE [GB]) [X] 1,3,4 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 2; figure - * [A] 5 [Y] 2 |