EP1151838 - Removing of Sleeves for Writing Devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merz & Krell GmbH & Co. KGaA Bahnhofstrasse 76 64401 Gross-Bieberau / DE | [2002/35] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states Merz & Krell GmbH & Co. Bahnhofstrasse 76 64401 Gross-Bieberau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, Werner Am Michelsgrund 31 69469 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
Vial, Siegbert Im Heiligen Feld 7 35099 Burgwald / DE | 03 /
Gantzert, Erich Pestalozzistrasse 54 64401 Gross-Bieberau / DE | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Leonhard, Frank Reimund, et al Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Leonhard, Frank Reimund, Dipl.-Ing., et al Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 57 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99121899.1 | 23.05.1996 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | EP19950108034 | 24.05.1995 Original published format: EP 95108034 | [2001/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1151838 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1151838 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C37/00 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
B43K7/005 (EP,US);
B29C33/444 (EP,US);
B29C37/0014 (EP,US);
B43K15/00 (EP,US);
B43K21/006 (EP,US);
B43K5/005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/15] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Entformung von Hülsen für Schreibgeräte | [2002/48] | English: | Removing of Sleeves for Writing Devices | [2001/45] | French: | Démoulage de manchons pour les instruments d'écriture | [2001/45] |
Former [2001/45] | Entformung von HÜlsen fÜr Schreibgeräte | Examination procedure | 25.02.2000 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 03.09.2001 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request accepted | 18.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/46] | 05.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96919574.2 / EP0833732 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.03.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2000 | 31.05.2001 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   16.07.2001 | 31.05.2003 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0031150 (WOLF GERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 2 * [Y] 2-6,12; | [XY]FR2340183 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 7-10 * figure 4; claim 4 * [Y] 2-6,12; | [A]EP0054681 (FISCHER ARTUR FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [A]US5059077 (SCHMID PAUL M [US]); | [A]GB2225550 (ELCONNEX PTY LTD [AU]); | [A]US5114655 (COLE HAROLD E [US]); | [A]US3424831 (SPATZ WALTER B); | [A]US4092073 (ANDERSON OLOF VERNER); | [PA]EP0672511 (TAKATA EUROP GMBH [DE]) |