blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0999360

EP0999360 - Fluid metering control valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  13.07.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2007New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused 
13.07.2007Refusal of applicationpublished on 15.08.2007  [2007/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kappel, Andreas, Dr.
Zugspitzstrasse 7
85649 Brunnthal / DE
[2000/19]
Application number, filing date99121902.305.11.1999
[2000/19]
Priority number, dateDE199815107905.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19851079
[2000/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0999360
Date:10.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:F02M47/02, F02M59/46
[2000/19]
CPC:
F02M47/027 (EP); F02M63/0035 (EP); F02M63/0036 (EP);
F02M63/0042 (EP); F02M63/0045 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2001/04]
Former [2000/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Steuerventil für Dosiervorrichtung für Fluid[2000/19]
English:Fluid metering control valve[2000/19]
French:Soupape de commande de dosage de fluide[2000/19]
Examination procedure07.11.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
28.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/33]
19.10.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
18.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
21.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200608   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0823550  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,6,8,9,11-16,18 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 32; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US5558068  (KUNISHIMA AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,11-15,17,18 * column 15, line 16 - column 16, line 4; figure 17 *;
 [X]EP0798459  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [X] 1,3-6,8,11-15,17,18 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 16; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0174083  (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-6,8,12-15,17,18 * page 11, line 31 - page 14, line 6 * * page 23, line 16 - line 19; figures 1,6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.