EP1000788 - Multicomponent closure member, in particular vehicle door, with a cast light-metal inner part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bosse, Axel, Dipl.-Ing. Friedrich-Naumann-Strasse 27 38444 Wolfsburg / DE | [2000/20] | Application number, filing date | 99121934.6 | 08.11.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | DE1998152234 | 12.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19852234 | [2000/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1000788 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1000788 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60J5/04, E05D5/02 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
B60J5/042 (EP);
E05D5/023 (EP);
E05D5/062 (EP);
F16B19/1054 (EP);
F16B19/1072 (EP);
F16B5/04 (EP);
E05Y2900/531 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/20] | Title | German: | Mehrteiliges Verschlussteil, insbesondere Fahrzeugtür, mit einem Innenteil aus Leichtmetallguss | [2000/20] | English: | Multicomponent closure member, in particular vehicle door, with a cast light-metal inner part | [2000/20] | French: | Elément de fermeture a composants multiples, en particulier porte de vehicule, avec une partie interne coulée en metal léger | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 27.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 17.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DE19616788 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) [DY] 1-6 * column 1, line 54 - column 1, line 63 * * column 2, line 13 - column 2, line 17 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 5 * * abstract *; | [DY]EP0579006 (YMOS AG IND PRODUKTE [DE]) [DY] 1 * column 1, line 19 - column 1, line 23 * * column 2, line 39 - column 2, line 52 * * abstract *; | [Y]EP0631831 (SCHRUFF HERBERTS [DE]) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 2 * * figure 8; claim 5 *; | [Y]DE29603789U (GROSS ALUMINIUM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,4 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 2, paragraph 5 - page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 3 * * figure 1; claims 1-3,5 *; | [Y]DE2441829 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [Y] 5 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]US5385383 (KREIS GUNDOLF [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * column 2, line 18 - column 2, line 28 * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 31 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 8 * * column 5, line 29 - column 5, line 34 * * abstract *; | [A]JPS5751383 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 6 * figures 2,3,4A,4B,5,6 * | by applicant | DE19616788 | EP0579006 | DE3102329 |